House
|
02/15/2024
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Garrett, Matayoshi, Perruso, Sayama, Takayama excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 454-24), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Evslin, Holt, Souza.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-09-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Ward excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 135-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 01-30-24 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|