House | 02/13/2024 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Alcos voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Kila, Takayama excused (2). | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 273-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Garcia; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-07-24 9:45AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Pending introduction. |