House
|
02/14/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Reported from WAL/HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 323-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, La Chica, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, M. Mizuno, Quinlan, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Todd, Woodson.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden, Takayama, Souza.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/HET on Wednesday, 01-31-24 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to WAL/HET, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|