House | 02/12/2024 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Lowen, Nakashima, Quinlan, Todd excused (5). | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 265-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt. | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-06-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Pending introduction. |