Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to EET, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 269).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 929-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-26-24 4:00PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-24.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-24 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Takayama excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 294-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Hussey-Burdick, Kong, Nakamura, Quinlan, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) La Chica.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 02-07-24 10:30AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Re-referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 5
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to ECD/HET, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|