Hawaii 2024 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB1964 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2024

Amended

Bill April 5, 2024
Bill March 20, 2024
Bill March 2, 2024
Bill February 9, 2024