Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Re-Referred to HOU/GVO/WTL, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to HOU/PSM/WTL, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 280).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Kapela, Marten, Perruso, Poepoe voting no (5) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1061-24) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Ichiyama, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Ilagan.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-29-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 2 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Ganaden, Hussey-Burdick, Marten, Poepoe voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Amato, Kapela voting no (2) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from HSG/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 611-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden, Hashem, Takayama.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Aiu, Miyake, Onishi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kila, Kitagawa.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/WAL on Thursday, 02-15-24 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Re-referred to HSG/WAL, JHA, referral sheet 11
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Recommitted to HSG with none voting no and Representative(s) Amato, Lowen, Nakashima, Quinlan, Todd excused.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 268-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending recommittal to HSG for further consideration.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Aiu, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kila.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-09-24 10:00AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 02-09-24 10:00AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Friday, 02-09-24 10:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to HSG, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|