Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
The recommendation was not adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Kim, Fevella; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to TCA/EET, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 281).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Kong, Pierick voting no (3) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1050-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Souza; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Miyake; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kong; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takayama.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-14-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Ward excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 164-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-01-24 9:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to EEP, JHA, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|