House | 02/14/2024 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3). | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 393-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso. | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-08-24 9:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 2 | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Pending introduction. |