House
|
02/16/2024
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 592-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Onishi, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Belatti; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Tam.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-14-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Ward excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 215-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Hussey-Burdick, Kong, Nakamura, Quinlan, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) La Chica.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-07-24 10:30AM in conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on ECD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 02-02-24 10:30AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|