Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported from HWN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3279) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chang, McKelvey.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Fevella, Keohokalole, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that its previous decision be RECONSIDERED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Ihara, Keohokalole, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella, Ihara; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
The committee(s) on HWN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-24 1:15PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to HWN/WTL, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 284).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Kapela, Perruso, Poepoe voting no (4) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 899-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ganaden; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Evslin.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-28-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Kapela voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Garrett, Matayoshi, Perruso, Sayama, Takayama excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 422-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-08-24 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|