LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Hawaii HI
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2066
Action History
HI
Hawaii House Bill HB2066
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Hawaii 2024 Regular Session
Hawaii House Bill HB2066
Action History
House
02/13/2024
The committee(s) on EEP/WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
House
02/01/2024
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WAL on Tuesday, 02-13-24 9:05AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
House
01/24/2024
Referred to EEP/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2
House
01/22/2024
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
House
01/19/2024
Pending introduction.