House
|
04/26/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-24 5:30PM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-24 3:30PM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-24 9:15AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-24 9:05AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-24 11:07AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-24 9:05AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Wakai Co-Chair; Rhoads.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 738).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Gates, La Chica, Kahaloa Co-Chairs; Woodson, Ward.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 555) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 4 (Senator(s) DeCoite, Elefante, Kim, Richards). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-09-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3782) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-05-24 10:21AM; Conference Room 211.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-24 10:15AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3263) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Public notice requirement waived pursuant to Senate Rule 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-24 1:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Re-Referred to AEN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to EDU/AEN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 296).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aiu, Kila voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1044-24) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Aiu, Kila, Morikawa; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-28-24 12:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 564-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Kapela, Marten, Martinez, M. Mizuno, Todd, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Perruso, Quinlan.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 02-15-24 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Ward excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 169-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Lowen, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-07-24 9:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to AGR, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|