Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
The committee on HHS deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to HHS/PSM, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 297).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1014-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Chun, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aiu, Cochran, Garrett.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-28-24 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from HLT/CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 569-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
The committee on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Chun, Ganaden, Ichiyama, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Poepoe, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takayama.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Marten.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-15-24 10:45AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
The committee(s) on HLT/CMV recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Thursday, 02-15-24 10:45AM in House conference room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/CMV on Wednesday, 02-14-24 10:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to HLT/CMV, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|