House | 02/06/2024 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela, Nakashima, Ward excused (3). | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 77-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Marten, Amato, Belatti, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ilagan, Nishimoto. | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 01-30-24 9:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 2 | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Pending introduction. |