Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3298) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, San Buenaventura, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 03-21-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Re-Referred to GVO, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to PSM, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 298).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Kong, Perruso, Poepoe voting no (4) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 913-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Lowen, Onishi, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Pierick; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-27-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 575-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ganaden; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-13-24 10:30AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|