Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Act 037, 05/28/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1137).
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Act 037, on 05/28/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1137).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 44-24).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday 05-01-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 44-24) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Inouye, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Ichiyama, Tarnas, Aiu, Miyake, Takayama, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-24 11:00AM in conference room 224.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 769).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: McKelvey Chair; Inouye, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 792).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Evslin, Ichiyama, Tarnas Co-Chairs; Aiu, Miyake, Takayama, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 556) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3727) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-02-24 10:05AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported from GVO/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3277) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
The committee(s) on GVO/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-24 3:10PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to GVO/WTL, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 36).
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cochran, Holt excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Cochran, Gates, Kapela, Perruso, Woodson excused (6).
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported from HSG/WAL/JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 624-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Aiu, Kila, Miyake, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Todd.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/WAL/JHA on Monday, 02-12-24 2:30PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to HSG/WAL/JHA, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|