Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3064) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Richards ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to AEN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 308).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1046-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Aiu, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Poepoe; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-24 1:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 532-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-14-24 9:15AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-24.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Monday, 02-12-24 2:00PM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|