House | 02/15/2024 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Garrett, Matayoshi, Perruso, Sayama, Takayama excused (5). | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 437-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Perruso, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Monday, 02-12-24 2:00PM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 2 | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Pending introduction. |