Senate
|
07/05/2024
|
Act 195, 07/03/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1296).
|
|
|
House
|
07/05/2024
|
Act 195, on 07/03/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1296).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 54-24).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday 05-01-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 54-24) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Keohokalole, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-24 11:05AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-23-24 9:00AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-22-24 11:00AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 760).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 689).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Keohokalole, Kanuha Co-Chairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Gates, Nakashima, Kahaloa Co-Chairs; Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Re-referred to AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 32
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 560) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from CPN/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3779) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino, Wakai.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN/WAM has rescheduled its decision making to 04-02-24 10:45AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-02-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3128) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Richards.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-24 1:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference (Proposed Draft).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to AEN, CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 38).
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, Marten, Onishi, Perruso voting no (4) and Representative(s) Cochran, Holt excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 697-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-24 1:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Re-referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 13
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Ward excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 173-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Lowen, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-07-24 9:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|