Hawaii 2024 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB2165 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/20/2024

                            HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES   H.B. NO.   2165     THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2024         STATE OF HAWAII                                A BILL FOR AN ACT     RELATING TO RENT CONTROL.     BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:   

HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 2165
THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2024
STATE OF HAWAII

HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

H.B. NO.

2165

THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2024

 

STATE OF HAWAII

 

 

 

 

 

 

A BILL FOR AN ACT

 

 

RELATING TO RENT CONTROL.

 

 

BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:

 

      SECTION 1.  (a)  Notwithstanding any other law to the contrary, no landlord shall rent or lease, or offer to rent or lease, a dwelling unit in the district described in section 4‑1(2)(D), Hawaii Revised Statutes, at a rate that exceeds the rate for which that dwelling unit was rented or leased or offered for rent or lease on August 7, 2023.      (b)  Any person who violates this Act shall be guilty of a misdemeanor and, upon conviction, shall be fined no more than $2,000, imprisoned no more than one year, or both.      (c)  For the purposes of this Act:      "Dwelling unit" has the same meaning as in section 521-8, Hawaii Revised Statutes.      "Landlord" has the same meaning as in section 521-8, Hawaii Revised Statutes.      SECTION 2.  This Act shall take effect upon its approval and shall be repealed on July 1, 2025.       INTRODUCED BY:   _____________________________              

     SECTION 1.  (a)  Notwithstanding any other law to the contrary, no landlord shall rent or lease, or offer to rent or lease, a dwelling unit in the district described in section 4‑1(2)(D), Hawaii Revised Statutes, at a rate that exceeds the rate for which that dwelling unit was rented or leased or offered for rent or lease on August 7, 2023.

     (b)  Any person who violates this Act shall be guilty of a misdemeanor and, upon conviction, shall be fined no more than $2,000, imprisoned no more than one year, or both.

     (c)  For the purposes of this Act:

     "Dwelling unit" has the same meaning as in section 521-8, Hawaii Revised Statutes.

     "Landlord" has the same meaning as in section 521-8, Hawaii Revised Statutes.

     SECTION 2.  This Act shall take effect upon its approval and shall be repealed on July 1, 2025.

 

INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________

INTRODUCED BY:

_____________________________

 

 

       Report Title: Rental Units; Dwelling Units; Rental Rates; Rent Control   Description: Prohibits a landlord from renting or leasing, or offering to rent or lease, a dwelling unit in the district described in section 4‑1(2)(D), HRS, at a rate that exceeds the rate for which that dwelling unit was rented or leased or offered for rent or lease on 8/7/2023.  Sunsets on 7/1/2025.       The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent. 

 

 

Report Title:

Rental Units; Dwelling Units; Rental Rates; Rent Control

 

Description:

Prohibits a landlord from renting or leasing, or offering to rent or lease, a dwelling unit in the district described in section 4‑1(2)(D), HRS, at a rate that exceeds the rate for which that dwelling unit was rented or leased or offered for rent or lease on 8/7/2023.  Sunsets on 7/1/2025.

 

 

 

The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.