Senate
|
07/08/2024
|
Act 208, 07/05/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1309).
|
|
|
House
|
07/08/2024
|
Act 208, on 07/05/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1309).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 41-24).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 05-01-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 41-24) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Rhoads, Kim, Elefante, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Nishimoto, Chun, Ilagan, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-24 3:30PM; Conference Room 016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-24 3:30PM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 728).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Senate Conferees Changed: Senator Wakai added as Chair. Senator Elefante discharged as Chair; Added as Co-Chair.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 760).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Chun, Ilagan, Takayama, Souza.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 677).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Elefante Chair; Rhoads, Kim Co-Chairs; Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 563) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3652) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha, Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-24 9:45AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3088) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Re-Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-24 3:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to PSM, WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 40).
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Holt excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 721-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Alcos; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Nishimoto, Poepoe.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-24 11:30AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Ward excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 127-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Ichiyama.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-01-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|