House | 02/14/2024 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3). | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 395-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Sayama, Amato, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Lowen, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Belatti, Gates. | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-06-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Pending introduction. |