Hawaii 2024 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB2228 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 2228 THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2024 STATE OF HAWAII A BILL FOR AN ACT relating to the DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATION. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
22
33 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 2228
44 THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2024
55 STATE OF HAWAII
66
77 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
88
99 H.B. NO.
1010
1111 2228
1212
1313 THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2024
1414
1515
1616
1717 STATE OF HAWAII
1818
1919
2020
2121
2222
2323
2424
2525
2626
2727
2828
2929
3030
3131 A BILL FOR AN ACT
3232
3333
3434
3535
3636
3737 relating to the DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATION.
3838
3939
4040
4141
4242
4343 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
4444
4545
4646
4747 SECTION 1. (a) Notwithstanding any law to the contrary, the department of corrections and rehabilitation shall establish a pilot program to allow inmates in its custody to perform work for the State. (b) The pilot program shall be separate from the Hawaii correctional industries program in chapter 354D, Hawaii Revised Statutes. (c) No later than September 1, 2024, the department of corrections and rehabilitation shall develop criteria to determine: (1) Which inmates shall be eligible to participate in the pilot program; (2) What type of work is appropriate for inmates in the pilot program to perform; and (3) The pay scale for which inmates shall be compensated for their work. (d) The department of corrections and rehabilitation shall implement the pilot program no later than October 1, 2024. SECTION 2. The department of corrections and rehabilitation shall submit a report of its findings and recommendations on the pilot program established pursuant to section 1, including any proposed legislation, to the legislature no later than twenty days before the convening of the regular session of 2026. SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 2024, and shall be repealed on June 30, 2026. INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________
4848
4949 SECTION 1. (a) Notwithstanding any law to the contrary, the department of corrections and rehabilitation shall establish a pilot program to allow inmates in its custody to perform work for the State.
5050
5151 (b) The pilot program shall be separate from the Hawaii correctional industries program in chapter 354D, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
5252
5353 (c) No later than September 1, 2024, the department of corrections and rehabilitation shall develop criteria to determine:
5454
5555 (1) Which inmates shall be eligible to participate in the pilot program;
5656
5757 (2) What type of work is appropriate for inmates in the pilot program to perform; and
5858
5959 (3) The pay scale for which inmates shall be compensated for their work.
6060
6161 (d) The department of corrections and rehabilitation shall implement the pilot program no later than October 1, 2024.
6262
6363 SECTION 2. The department of corrections and rehabilitation shall submit a report of its findings and recommendations on the pilot program established pursuant to section 1, including any proposed legislation, to the legislature no later than twenty days before the convening of the regular session of 2026.
6464
6565 SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 2024, and shall be repealed on June 30, 2026.
6666
6767
6868
6969 INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________
7070
7171 INTRODUCED BY:
7272
7373 _____________________________
7474
7575
7676
7777
7878
7979 Report Title: Pilot Program; Inmates to Perform Work for State; Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation Description: Requires the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation to establish a pilot program to allow inmates to perform work for the State. Sunsets on 6/30/2026. The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.
8080
8181
8282
8383
8484
8585 Report Title:
8686
8787 Pilot Program; Inmates to Perform Work for State; Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
8888
8989
9090
9191 Description:
9292
9393 Requires the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation to establish a pilot program to allow inmates to perform work for the State. Sunsets on 6/30/2026.
9494
9595
9696
9797
9898
9999
100100
101101 The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.