Senate
|
07/09/2024
|
Act 251, 07/09/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1356).
|
|
|
House
|
07/09/2024
|
Act 251, on 07/09/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1356).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 764).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Matsumoto, Pierick voting no (3) and Representative(s) Garcia, Kila, Nakashima excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 758).
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 568) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3651) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-27-24 9:45AM; CR 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3086) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-24 3:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to PSM, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 321).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Aiu voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Kila, Pierick voting no (4) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 944-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Aiu, Kila, Alcos, Ward; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Nishimoto, Poepoe.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-24 11:30AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Ward excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 129-24), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Ichiyama.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-01-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|