Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
The recommendation was not adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 1 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 3 No(es): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
The committee(s) on EET/TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to EET/TCA, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 326).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Gates, Holt, Kahaloa, Kila, Lamosao, Poepoe, Ward voting no (8) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1048-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Chun, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Aiu, Kahaloa, Poepoe, Alcos; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lamosao, Ward; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Garrett, Kila.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-24 11:30AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Gates, Holt, Kila, Lamosao, Ward voting no (6) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 618-24), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
The committee on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Tam, Martinez, Garrett, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kapela, Matayoshi, Sayama.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-14-24 10:30AM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
The committee(s) on CAI recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-24.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Friday, 02-09-24 10:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CAI with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Gates, Kapela, Nakashima excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 65-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CAI.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
The committee on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Hussey-Burdick, La Chica, Nakamura, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Holt, Kong, Lamosao; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Thursday, 02-01-24 10:30AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to TOU, CAI, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|