Senate
|
07/08/2024
|
Act 226, 07/08/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1327).
|
|
|
House
|
07/08/2024
|
Act 226, on 07/08/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1327).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 132-24).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 05-01-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 132-24) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Todd, Poepoe, Ganaden, M. Mizuno; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garcia.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Inouye, Gabbard, DeCoite; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-24 3:15PM; Conference Room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-24 3:15PM; Conference Room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-24 3:15PM; Conference Room 229.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 758).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Kim Chair; Inouye, Gabbard, DeCoite Co-Chairs; Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 760).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Ichiyama, Todd, Poepoe Co-Chairs; Ganaden, M. Mizuno, Garcia.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) DeCoite, Fevella, McKelvey, Richards . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 569) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-09-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3758) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-04-24 10:16AM; CR 211.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-24 10:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported from HRE/WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3306) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Richards, DeCoite; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
The committee on AEN will reconsider its previous decision on 03-18-24 and will hold a public decision making on 03-21-24 1:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Public notice requirement waived pursuant to Senate Rule 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
The recommendation was not adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Richards, DeCoite; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Rhoads.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Hashimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
The committee(s) on HRE/WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-24 1:30PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to HRE/WTL/AEN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 127).
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Quinlan, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 848-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-26-24 3:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from WAL/HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 493-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, La Chica, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, M. Mizuno, Quinlan, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Todd, Woodson.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/HET on Wednesday, 01-31-24 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to WAL/HET, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|