Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 767).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Takenouchi, Tarnas, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; Takayama, Tam, Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Re-referred to HLT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 33
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 570) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-09-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from CPN/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3781) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, DeCoite.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-24 10:09AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Reported from HHS/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3115) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Keohokalole, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to HHS/PSM, CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 327).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1058-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Evslin, Ganaden, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Takayama, Holt, Souza.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-16-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Takayama excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 307-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-07-24 11:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-24 11:30 AM, House conference room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-02-24 8:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to HLT, JHA, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|