House
|
02/13/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Kila, Takayama excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Reported from LGO/EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 280-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Kapela, Matayoshi, M. Mizuno; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Garcia; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Marten, Martinez, Perruso, Quinlan, Todd.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Martinez, Sayama.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO/EDN on Thursday, 02-08-24 10:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Re-referred to LGO/EDN, FIN, referral sheet 7
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|