House
|
02/16/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 568-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-08-24 9:31AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-24.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-01-24 9:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|