Senate
|
07/05/2024
|
Act 198, 07/03/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1299).
|
|
|
House
|
07/05/2024
|
Act 198, on 07/03/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1299).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, Onishi voting no (2) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 48-24).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday 05-01-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 48-24) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Gates, Kahaloa, Sayama, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Richards, Rhoads, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-24 2:30PM in conference room 224.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 768).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Senate Conferees Changed: Senator Keohokalole discharged as Chair; Added as Co-Chair. Senator Richards discharged as Member; Added as Chair.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-24 2:30PM in conference room 224.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 725).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Richards, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 738).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Gates Co-Chairs; Kahaloa, Sayama, Pierick.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Re-referred to CPC, AGR, referral sheet 31
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 572) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3658) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-02-24 10:05AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3336) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) McKelvey, Richards ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 03-21-24 10:30AM; CR 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to CPN, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 334).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Cochran, Garrett, Holt, Kahaloa, Lowen, Nishimoto, Quinlan, Todd excused (9).
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 684-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Lowen, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-27-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Re-referred to CPC, referral sheet 14
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 02-09-24 9:30AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-09-24 9:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to AGR, CPC, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|