12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
House | 01/31/2023 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Garcia, Kobayashi, Takayama voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Amato, Kong, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (4). | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 01/27/2023 | The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, Quinlan, Todd, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, Garcia; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Friday, 01-27-23 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/20/2023 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Pending introduction. |