House
|
04/22/2024
|
Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 728).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Senate Conferees Changed: Senator Hashimoto added as Co-Chair. Senator Moriwaki discharged as Co-Chair.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 677).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Chang Chair; Moriwaki Co-Chair; Aquino.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 577) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-09-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3810) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-24 10:15AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3095) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto, Aquino; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to HOU, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 340).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aiu, Garcia, Perruso, Pierick, Poepoe voting no (5) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1040-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Aiu, Poepoe; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-28-24 12:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Garrett, Matayoshi, Perruso, Sayama, Takayama excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 475-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takayama.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-13-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Ward excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 159-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Aiu, Kila, Kitagawa, Miyake, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 02-07-24 10:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to HSG, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|