House | 02/07/2024 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Ward excused (2). | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 153-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Sayama, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Alcos. | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Friday, 02-02-24 9:30AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Pending introduction. |