Hawaii 2024 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB2340 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2024

Amended

Bill April 5, 2024
Bill March 20, 2024
Bill March 1, 2024
Bill February 12, 2024