Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Reported from HOU/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3191) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Rhoads ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto, Aquino, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on HOU/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to HOU/AEN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 351).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Amato, Ganaden, Hussey-Burdick, Kapela, Perruso, Poepoe, Tam voting no (7) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 879-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Poepoe; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-26-24 12:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Amato voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cochran, Hussey-Burdick, Kapela, Poepoe voting no (4) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from HSG/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 612-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Kahaloa, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cochran; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Perruso, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Aiu, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kila.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/EEP on Thursday, 02-15-24 10:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to HSG/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|