House | 02/15/2024 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Garrett, Matayoshi, Perruso, Sayama, Takayama excused (5). | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 416-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden. | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-09-24 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Pending introduction. |