House | 02/16/2024 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5). | ||
House | 02/16/2024 | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 545-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Onishi, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Lowen, Pierick. | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-13-24 2:05PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Pending introduction. |