Senate
|
07/02/2024
|
Act 157, 07/01/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1258).
|
|
|
House
|
07/02/2024
|
Act 157, on 07/01/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1258).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 782).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Garcia excused (2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 771).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 603) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3725) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 04-04-24 10:01AM; CR 016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-02-24 10:05AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported from EDU/LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3242) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Ihara, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Hashimoto, Richards, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
The committee(s) on EDU/LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-24 3:02PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to EDU/LBT, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 369).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 904-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Evslin, Ganaden, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Takayama, Holt, Souza.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-16-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Garcia, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Kila, Takayama excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Reported from LGO/EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 278-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Kapela, Matayoshi, M. Mizuno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Garcia; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Marten, Martinez, Perruso, Quinlan, Todd.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Martinez, Sayama.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO/EDN on Thursday, 02-08-24 10:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to LGO/EDN, JHA, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|