Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported from LBT/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3239) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Ihara, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Hashimoto, Richards, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
The committee(s) on LBT/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-24 3:02PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to LBT/EDU, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 134).
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cochran, Quinlan, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 818-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-24 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Takayama excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Reported from LGO/EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 279-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Kapela, Matayoshi, M. Mizuno, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Marten, Martinez, Perruso, Quinlan, Todd.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Martinez, Sayama.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO/EDN on Thursday, 02-08-24 10:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to LGO/EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|