Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-24 3:35PM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-24 1:46PM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 767).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Matayoshi, Nakashima, Takenouchi Co-Chairs; Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 689).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Keohokalole, Rhoads Co-Chairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 605) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante, McKelvey, Richards. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from CPN/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3741) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) McKelvey, Richards ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN/JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-02-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3181) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to HHS, CPN/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 372).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1015-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Chun, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aiu, Cochran, Garrett.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-28-24 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 591-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Onishi, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Tam.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-14-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Ward excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Reported from HLT/LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 193-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Sayama, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kapela, Martinez.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/LGO on Wednesday, 02-07-24 9:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Re-referred to HLT/LGO, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 9
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to LGO/HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|