House | 02/08/2024 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Kong, Pierick voting no (4) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Ward excused (4). | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 201-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Garcia; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 01-31-24 8:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Referred to HLT, CPC, JHA, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Pending introduction. |