Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
Act 073, 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1174).
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2024
|
Act 073, on 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1174).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 782).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Garcia excused (2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 771).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 677).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Aquino Chair; Lee Co-Chair; Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 619) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3760) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Kidani.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-24 10:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Reported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3132) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Ihara, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-24 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to LBT, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 387).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Matayoshi, Woodson excused (5). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 951-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Alcos, Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-24 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 226-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Sayama, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 02-06-24 9:15AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|