Senate
|
07/08/2024
|
Act 227, 07/08/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1328).
|
|
|
House
|
07/08/2024
|
Act 227, on 07/08/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1328).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 46-24).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday 05-01-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 46-24) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Rhoads.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Sayama, Poepoe, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-24 10:30AM in conference room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-24 10:30AM; CR 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 760).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Ichiyama, Sayama Co-Chairs; Poepoe, Souza.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 677).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Keohokalole, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 622) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-09-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3737) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-04-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported from WTL/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3332) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, McKelvey, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chang.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
The committee(s) on WTL/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-24 9:36AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to WTL/CPN, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 390).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 912-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Lowen, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-27-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 497-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Bill re-scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-06-24 10:15AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-01-24 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|