House
|
02/16/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Alcos, Hussey-Burdick, Lowen, Matsumoto, Tam voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 574-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Morikawa, Souza; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Bill re-scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-06-24 10:15AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-01-24 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|