Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to WTL, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 146).
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Kong, Morikawa voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Gates, Kahaloa, Kapela, Kila, La Chica, Lowen, Miyake, Souza, Tam, Ward voting no (12) and Representative(s) Cochran, Quinlan, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 850-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Chun, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Lamosao, Morikawa, Alcos; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-26-24 3:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Kapela, Lowen, Matsumoto, Tam voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 552-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Morikawa; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Souza; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-06-24 10:15AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-24.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-01-24 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|