Hawaii 2024 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB2488 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 2488 THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2024 H.D. 1 STATE OF HAWAII S.D. 1 A BILL FOR AN ACT RELATING TO THE TAXATION BOARD OF REVIEW. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
1+HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 2488 THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2024 H.D. 1 STATE OF HAWAII A BILL FOR AN ACT RELATING TO THE TAXATION BOARD OF REVIEW. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
22
33 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 2488
44 THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2024 H.D. 1
5-STATE OF HAWAII S.D. 1
5+STATE OF HAWAII
66
77 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
88
99 H.B. NO.
1010
1111 2488
1212
1313 THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2024
1414
1515 H.D. 1
1616
1717 STATE OF HAWAII
1818
19-S.D. 1
19+
2020
2121
2222
2323
2424
2525
2626
2727
2828
2929
3030
3131 A BILL FOR AN ACT
3232
3333
3434
3535
3636
3737 RELATING TO THE TAXATION BOARD OF REVIEW.
3838
3939
4040
4141
4242
4343 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
4444
4545
4646
47- SECTION 1. Section 232-6, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by amending subsection (b) to read as follows: "(b) The board shall consist of three salaried members who shall be residents of the State and shall be appointed for terms of six years each and be removable by the governor as provided in section 26-34; provided that the terms of the salaried members first appointed shall end on June 30, 2025, June 30, 2027, and June 30, 2029, respectively, as designated by the governor at the time of their appointments. Notwithstanding section 26-34, no member shall be appointed to the board for more than three consecutive terms. The governor shall designate a member of the board to act as its chairperson, who shall be[: (1) An attorney at law licensed to practice in all courts of the State; or (2) A certified public accountant having experience in the State.] an attorney or accounting professional with experience in Hawaii state taxes. In addition, the governor shall designate a member of the board to act as vice chairperson who shall serve as the chairperson of the board during the temporary absence from the State[,] or temporary inability to act due to recusal, illness, or disqualification of the chairperson. Any vacancy in the board shall be filled for the unexpired term." SECTION 2. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. New statutory material is underscored. SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 2024.
47+ SECTION 1. Section 232-6, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by amending subsection (b) to read as follows: "(b) The board shall consist of three salaried members who shall be residents of the State and shall be appointed for terms of six years each and be removable by the governor as provided in section 26-34; provided that the terms of the salaried members first appointed shall end on June 30, 2025, June 30, 2027, and June 30, 2029, respectively, as designated by the governor at the time of their appointments. Notwithstanding section 26-34, no member shall be appointed to the board for more than three consecutive terms. The governor shall designate a member of the board to act as its chairperson, who shall be[: (1) An attorney at law licensed to practice in all courts of the State; or (2) A certified public accountant having experience in the State.] an attorney or accounting professional with experience in Hawaii state taxes. In addition, the governor shall designate a member of the board to act as vice chairperson who shall serve as the chairperson of the board during the temporary absence from the State[,] or temporary inability to act due to recusal, illness, or disqualification of the chairperson. Any vacancy in the board shall be filled for the unexpired term." SECTION 2. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. New statutory material is underscored. SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 3000.
4848
4949 SECTION 1. Section 232-6, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by amending subsection (b) to read as follows:
5050
5151 "(b) The board shall consist of three salaried members who shall be residents of the State and shall be appointed for terms of six years each and be removable by the governor as provided in section 26-34; provided that the terms of the salaried members first appointed shall end on June 30, 2025, June 30, 2027, and June 30, 2029, respectively, as designated by the governor at the time of their appointments. Notwithstanding section 26-34, no member shall be appointed to the board for more than three consecutive terms. The governor shall designate a member of the board to act as its chairperson, who shall be[:
5252
5353 (1) An attorney at law licensed to practice in all courts of the State; or
5454
5555 (2) A certified public accountant having experience in the State.] an attorney or accounting professional with experience in Hawaii state taxes.
5656
5757 In addition, the governor shall designate a member of the board to act as vice chairperson who shall serve as the chairperson of the board during the temporary absence from the State[,] or temporary inability to act due to recusal, illness, or disqualification of the chairperson. Any vacancy in the board shall be filled for the unexpired term."
5858
5959 SECTION 2. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. New statutory material is underscored.
6060
61- SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 2024.
61+ SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 3000.
6262
63- Report Title: Taxation Board of Review; Chairperson Description: Amends the minimum qualifications for the Chairperson of the Taxation Board of Review. (SD1) The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.
63+ Report Title: Taxation Board of Review; Chairperson Description: Amends the minimum qualifications for the Chairperson of the Taxation Board of Review. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1) The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.
6464
6565
6666
6767
6868
6969 Report Title:
7070
7171 Taxation Board of Review; Chairperson
7272
7373
7474
7575 Description:
7676
77-Amends the minimum qualifications for the Chairperson of the Taxation Board of Review. (SD1)
77+Amends the minimum qualifications for the Chairperson of the Taxation Board of Review. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
7878
7979
8080
8181
8282
8383
8484
8585 The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.