Senate
|
07/02/2024
|
Act 135, 07/01/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1236).
|
|
|
House
|
07/02/2024
|
Act 135, on 07/01/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1236).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 782).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Garcia excused (2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 771).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 634) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3689) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-04-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3231) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-24 3:05PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to TCA, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 398).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1052-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takayama.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-14-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Lowen, Nakashima, Quinlan, Todd excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 259-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Tuesday, 02-06-24 10:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|