Hawaii 2024 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB2499 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2024

Amended

Bill April 6, 2024
Bill March 21, 2024
Bill February 16, 2024
Bill February 6, 2024