House | 02/12/2024 | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Monday, 02-12-24 2:00PM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 02-09-24 9:30AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-09-24 9:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Referred to AGR, JHA, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Pending introduction. |